Fusco et al v. ACMI Corporation
Plaintiff: Jude T. Fusco and Jean A. Fusco
Defendant: ACMI Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv02340
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE. Stipulated 44 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice is granted. All claims asserted are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/21/09.(wjc, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/18/09. (wjc, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Defendant's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order (Unopposed). Discovery due by 10/10/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2009. Settlement Conference set for 7/20/2009 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/06/09.(wjc, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute ORDER granting 25 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/9/09.(gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusco et al v. ACMI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jude T. Fusco
Represented By: James Hallett Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean A. Fusco
Represented By: James Hallett Guest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACMI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?