Zordel et al v. Avalon Correctional Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Allison (I) Knudson, Allison Knudson, Theresa (I) Zordel and Theresa Zordel
Defendant: Chris Meyer, Avalon Correctional Services, Inc., Tom Sullivan and Heidi Faust
Case Number: 1:2008cv02356
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to the 75 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/19/09.(ebs, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Renewed Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/12/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2009, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/27/09.(ebs, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 51 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery, as set forth in this Order. Compelled disclosures and compelled discovery responses to be served on the defendant by 7/15/09, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/24/09. (ebs, )
June 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF WEBB ONLY Granting 56 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Claims by Plaintiff Alisha Webb, With Prejudice. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), all claims asserted in this matter by plaintiff Alisha Webb only are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/21/09.(ebs, )
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE Granting 46 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Breach of Contract Claim. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), Plaintiffs fifth claim against defendant for breach of contract asserted in its Amended Complaint [Docket No. 38] is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/18/09.(ebs, )
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order and Set Scheduling Conference. Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/7/09.(ebs, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 27 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. Clerk shall accept for filing the Amended Complaint 28 . The case caption shall be modified as indicated in this Order, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/2/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zordel et al v. Avalon Correctional Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Meyer
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Correctional Services, Inc.
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sullivan
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Faust
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison (I) Knudson
Represented By: Paul Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Knudson
Represented By: Paul Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa (I) Zordel
Represented By: Paul Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Zordel
Represented By: Paul Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?