United Western Bank v. National City Mortgage Company
Plaintiff: United Western Bank
Defendant: National City Mortgage Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv02361
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 61 filed 11/12/2009 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/18/2009, isVACATED. The jury trial set to commence 01/04/2010, is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/13/2009. (sah, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2009. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 32 , filed 7/29/2009 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDI CE. ORDERED: Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint 38], filed 8/18/2009 is GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion to Withdraw Sean T. Olson as Co-Counsel of Record. Attorney Sean T. Olson is withdrawn as counsel of record in the above captioned matter. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/24/2009.(sah, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/10/2009. (sah, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Four (4) Day Jury Trial set for 1/4/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/18/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 701 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/13/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Western Bank v. National City Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Western Bank
Represented By: Julie J. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage Company
Represented By: Julie M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?