Home Design Services, Inc. v. Bohnenkamp Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Defendant: Bohnenkamp Construction, Inc., Michael Bohnenkamp, Leroy Brown and Shirley Brown
Case Number: 1:2008cv02391
Filed: November 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Copyright Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL The court takes judicial notice that the parties have filed a Stipulation for Dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) (ii). Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/3/2010. (erv, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MINUTE ORDER: Counsel having advised the court that the case has settled, all pending motions are now moot. Dismissal Paper due by 5/3/2010, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/9/10.(ebs, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 AMENDED NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS ONLY re: 143 Notice. Counts 2, 3, 4, and 5 of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. The only remaining claim is Count 1, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/7/10. (ebs, )
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS ONLY pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). Counts 1, 3, 4, and 5 of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/6/10. (ebs, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Stipulated Confidentiality (PROTECTIVE) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/3/2010. (kmtcd, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF PARTY pursuant to the 79 Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims Against Defendant Gayla Warner, With Prejudice. All claims are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Gayla Warner, each party to bear her, his, or its own attorneys' fees and costs, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 12/2/09. (ebs, )
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Motion Hearing held on 11/24/2009. Defendants 74 MOTION to amend/Correct/Modify Deposition Subpoena Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 45(c)(3) and Request for Forthwith Hearing, filed November 20, 2009 is GRANTED. Mr. Schmitt, will be deposed in Denver to the extent that Home Design Services wants to depose the witness. Defendants Counsel shall arrange for a conference room to be available for the deposition. Plaintiffs Oral Request for Defense Counsel to bear the costs for travel in connection with the deposition of Mr. Schmitt is DENIED. Plaintiffs Oral Motion to Extend the Discovery deadline is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. (FTR - Debra Brown) (kmtcd)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: The Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2010 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/19/09. (ebs, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 THIRD ORDER RE-SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/16/09. (ebs, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Minute ORDER granting 61 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend First AmendedComplaint. The Clerk of Court is directed file Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint - Injunctive Relief Sought (#61-2). Denying 60 Stipulated Motion to Vacate All Deadlines Contained Within the Scheduling Order of January 20, 2009 and Set Planning/Scheduling Conference. The parties shall file a status report no later than ten days after service of the new defendant to advise whether a settlement conference would be beneficial and to advise the court as to the status of discovery and other deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/3/09.(kmtcd)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SECOND ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, Settlement Conference Reset for 9/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/17/09. (erv, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE (ORDER) of Dismissal of Certain Claims Only. Court takes judicial notice of the 53 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice. Statutory damages and attorney's fees claims are dismissed without prejuidice, each party to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/20/09. (gms, )
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Settlement Conference reset for 9/24/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/10/09. (gmssl, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Settlement Conference reset for 5/21/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/12/09. (ebs, )
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/20/09. (gmssl, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Notice (ORDER) of Dismissal of Leroy Brown and Shirley Brown only. Parties having filed 25 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party, complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to Leroy Brown and Shirley, each to pay their own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/8/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Design Services, Inc. v. Bohnenkamp Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Design Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M. Lawhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohnenkamp Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bohnenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?