October 26, 2011 |
Filing
181
ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 178 Notice of Appeal by Michael Marotta, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/26/11. (bjr, )
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing
177
ORDER AFFIRMED and ADOPTED in its entirety 173 Report and Recommendations of the Untied States Magistrate Judge. granting 154 Motion for Summary Judgment; Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs only remaining Third Claim for Relief in the Fourth Amended Complaint, ECF No. 39 . It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Objection to Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, ECF No. 174 , is OVERRULED. by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/30/2011.(erv, )
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
167
ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and to file, on or before 2/23/2011, a Joint Status Report. By Judge William J. Martinez on 2/14/2011. (sah, )
|
July 7, 2010 |
Filing
138
ORDER denying 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment; denying 137 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/7/2010.(erv, )
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
130
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/10/2010. The parties are reminded that they will be required to comply fully with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR.7.2, and particularly those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal.(cbscd)
|
March 29, 2010 |
Filing
114
ORDER Denying 102 Defendant Patrick Sorans Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/29/2010.(erv, )
|
March 11, 2010 |
Filing
106
ORDER - The Request for Clarification Regarding Second Order Setting Scheduling Conference, doc # 104 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The caption of the case has been corrected. The Scheduling Conference set of 4/5/2010 at 10:00 a.m. shall proceed as scheduled by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/11/2010.(cbscd)
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
99
SECOND ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 4/5/2010 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom A 402, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/19/10. (cbssec)
|
February 16, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 87 Report and Recommendations the United States Magistrate Judge. granting 59 Defendants Cortezs and Blacks Motion to Dismiss All Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Defendants Cortez and Black are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this civil action; granting 60 Defendants Rocco-McKeels and the City and County of Denvers Partial Motion to Dismiss Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); granting 61 Defendant Denver Police Departments Motion to Dismi ss All Claims Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)and Defendant Denver Police Department is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; granting 64 Defendant Patrick Sorans Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), and Defendant Patrick Soran is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; denying 80 Plaintiff Mr. Marottas Motion for Summary Judgment Pertaining to Defendant Soran Motion for Summary Judgment; by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/16/2010.(erv, )
|
January 20, 2010 |
Filing
97
ORDER - The Request to File Fifth Amended Complaint, doc # 92 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with leave to refile the request after and in accordance with the District Judge's ruling on the pending Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 1/20/2010.(cbscd)
|
May 26, 2009 |
Filing
83
ORDER re: 81 Order on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, the Court hereby ORDERS that this Courts Order Affirming Magistrate Judges March 26, 2009 Order is VACATED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/26/09. (erv, )
|
April 2, 2009 |
Filing
58
ORDER WITHDRAWING 55 Order of March 26, 2009, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/2/09. (erv, )
|
March 26, 2009 |
Filing
55
WITHDRAWN ORDER re: 54 Request for document filed by Michael P. Marotta is GRANTED on this one occasion. The court requests that the Clerk of the Court re-mail to Mr. Marotta a copy of the courts March 13, 2009 Order 51 . From this date f orward, Mr. Marotta may obtain copies of filings in this case from the Clerk of the Court, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, First Floor, Room A- 105, 901 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/26/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 4/2/2009 showing Order as WITHDRAWN )(erv, ).
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 48 Defendant Patrick Sorans Joinder in Defendants Officers Cortez, Black, Rocco-McKeel, the Denver Police Department and the City and County of Denvers Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Fourth Amended Complaint, treated as a motion for an extension of time to respond to the Fourth Amended Complaint on or before 4/7/09 by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/13/09.(erv, )
|
February 25, 2009 |
Filing
41
ORDER denying 38 Motion to Amend Complaint as unnecessary. The Fourth Amended Complaint 39 is accepted for filing as of 2/24/09. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 2/25/09.(erv, )
|
February 17, 2009 |
Filing
37
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer: withdrawing without prejudice 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; withdrawing without prejudice 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; withdraw ing without prejudice 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; withdrawing without prejudice 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Status Conference held on 2/17/2009. That the Plaintiff may file a Fourth Amended Complaint on or before March 10, 2009, the Defendant shall file a response to the Fourth Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the filing of the Fourth Amended Complaint. (Court Reporter FTR Ginny Kramer.) (erv, )
|