Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Albertson's, LLC
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Albertson's, LLC
Case Number: 1:2008cv02424
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONSENT DECREE EEOC and Albertsons desire to resolve the actions by entry of this agreed upon Consent Decree by the Court without modification. The Parties agree that the Court has the power to enter this Consent Decree and to grant the monetary and equitale relief set forth herein. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/14/09. (erv, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/1/09. (msksec, )
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings. Scheduling Conference set for 02/25/09 is vacated. Status Report due by 3/23/2009, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 02/19/09.(wjc, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene by Applicant Christopher Adams. Cleark of Court is instructed to accept for filing the Complaint and Jury Demand of Intervenor Christopher Adams, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 01/12/09.(wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Albertson's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: David Andrew Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?