Barone v. United Air Lines
Plaintiff: Mary Barone
Defendant: United Air Lines
Case Number: 1:2008cv02487
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. The Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. Case No. 08-cv-02487-REB-MJW is consolidated with this matter and all further filings will be made in 07-cv- 01277-LTB-KMT. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 01/22/2010. (sah, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 45 United's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses as Moot, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2009.(mjwcd )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 14 , filed 12/18/2008, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED with respect to plaintiffs breach of contract claim, which is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The motion is DENIED otherwise. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/26/2009.(sah, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference 8/31/2009 10:00 AM is vacated, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 08/25/2009.(mjwcd)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five ( 5) Day Trial to Court set for 2/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/29/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/17/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barone v. United Air Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Barone
Represented By: John R. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Air Lines
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?