Moon v. Boulder, City of, State of Colorado, The et al
Plaintiff: Carol Eve Moon
Defendant: Boulder, City of, State of Colorado, The, Kristen Nolan, Melanie Patterson and Jeremy Frenzen
Case Number: 1:2008cv02501
Filed: November 18, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 117 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss, and dismissing with prejudice Melanie Patterson, Jeremy Frenzen, Kristen Nolan by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/9/13. This case is dismissed with prejudice. (dkals, )
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re: 114 . By no later than 5/13/2013, Defendants shall either provide to Plaintiff the requested signed settlement agreement or file a Motion for Reconsideration with this Court, explaining why they are unable to provide the requested signed settlement agreement. ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/29/2013. (cmacd)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Regarding Status Reports by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/3/13. (dkals, )
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING this action pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, with leave to be reopened by the parties for purposes of filing their settlement agreement and requesting that the case be dismissed. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/18/2011. (erv, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: This case has been resolved, subject to the satisfaction of one contingency within the next 90 days. On or before July 8, 2010, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/8/10. (bnbcd, )
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER : Pretrial Conference set for April 12, 2010, is VACATED, to be reset at a later date, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/21/09. (bnbcd, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 62 Defendants Motion to Compel Production of Records or Alternatively Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents. IT IS ORDERED that the Minute Order entered on December 18, 2009 67 is VACATED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/18/09.(erv, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/09. (bnbcd, )
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER A Supplemental Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/14/09. (erv, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference and Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. All defendants shall answer or respond to the plaintiffs complaint on or before March 20, 2009. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for February 9, 2009, is vacated and reset to April 14, 2009, at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The proposed Scheduling Order, submitted pursuant to District of Colorado ECF Procedures V.L.1.b., is due on or before April 7, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/23/09.(erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Boulder, City of, State of Colorado, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Eve Moon
Represented By: Gary D. Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder, City of, State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Frenzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?