Hubler v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Stewart Hubler
Defendant: Ari W. Zavaras, Rusty Lander and Anthony DeCesaro
Case Number: 1:2008cv02546
Filed: November 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Huerfano
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 64 Notice of Appeal by Gregory Hubler, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/13/10. Appellant has 30 days to file a proper 1915 motion and certified trust fund account statement with the district court.(bjrsl, )
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/18/10.(ebs, )
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER accepting 54 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and adopting the reasoning therein. The objections 55 of plaintiff Gregory Stewart Hubler to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge are overruled. Defendant' s Motion to Dismiss 38 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Supplemental Pleading and Additional Request for Relief in the Form of a Preliminary Injunction 47 is denied. Plaintiff's objection to the magistrate judge's denial of appointment of counsel 30 is overruled. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 59 is denied. Judgment shall enter in favor of defendant and against plaintiff, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/10/10.(ebs, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Objection to the Order Dismissing Counts One and Three of His Complaint, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/9/10.(ebs, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 38 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss be granted, and that 47 Plaintiff's MOTION to Submit Supplemental Pleading and Additional Request for Relief in the Form of a Preliminary Injunction be denied, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/12/09. (ebs, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Notice of Address Change and Request for Statement on the Status of the Case. Clerk shall send to the plaintiff a copy of the most current docket sheet, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/11/09.(ebs, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL, with Certificate of Mailing, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/9/09. (ebs, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Assign Case. First and third claims in the amended complaint are dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 A(b)(1) as legally frivolous and Defendants Ari W. Zavaras and Anthony DeCesaro are dismissed as parties to this action. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/04/2009. (sah, )
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/16/09. (jjh, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER denying as premature 13 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/15/09.(jjh, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER granting 6 Motion to Amend Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/07/09.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubler v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stewart Hubler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari W. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?