Thrulow et al v. Countrywide Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peter D. Thrulow, Jr. and Michelle A. Martinez
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Bank of New York
Case Number: 1:2008cv02582
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 11 RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING ACTION. The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation in its entirety. The 2 Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to diligently prosecute this action under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The Clerk of the Court shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 09/15/09.(wjc, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge the case be dismissed with prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/24/09. (wjc, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 01/27/09 is reset for 3/10/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Plaintiffs are ordered to confer with defense counsel to create a Scheduling Order as required by the Court's Order dated 12/03/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/23/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrulow et al v. Countrywide Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter D. Thrulow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Financial Corporation
Represented By: P. Christian Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: P. Christian Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York
Represented By: P. Christian Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?