Stanko v. Davis et al
Petitioner: Rudy Stanko
Respondent: Blake Davis and Harley Lappin
Case Number: 1:2008cv02615
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: 16 Notice of Appeal filed by Rudy Stanko by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/25/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Strike Applicant's Motion for Leave to Amend Petition by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/06/09.(jjh, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the habeas corpus application, as amended, is denied and the action is dismissed as an abuse of the writ by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 02/04/09. (jjh, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Overruling Objection. Ordered that Applicant continues to have 20 days after the filing of the Preliminary Response to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/07/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanko v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudy Stanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Blake Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harley Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?