Heichel et al v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Donald Heichel and Judy Heichel
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 1:2008cv02649
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorneys feesand costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/7/09. (erv, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Joint Motion to Amend the Amended Minute Order. The Amended Minute Order 31 is further amended as follows: The Court's Order that the Settlement Agreement be confidential and that breach of said confidentiality be subject to an award of damages is stricken. The remainder of the Amended Minute Order 31 remains in effect, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/29/09.(ebs, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion for Order for Plaintiff Judge Heichel to Participate in Settlement Conference by Telephone by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/9/09.(erv, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/28/2009. Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/12/09.(erv, ) (Modified on 5/13/2009 Corrected Discovery date)(erv2, ).
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/16/09. (erv, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/8/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heichel et al v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Heichel
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Heichel
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?