Medina v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Alex Medina
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, Margaret (I) Heil and Margaret Heil
Case Number: 1:2008cv02654
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 24 filed 09/23/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The defendants Motion To Dismiss 16 filed 03/09/2009, is GRANTED. Under FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), the plaintiffs Prisoner Complaint 3 filed 12/08/2008, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. JUDGMENT SHALL ENTER in favor of the defendants, ColoradoDepartment of Corrections and Margaret Heil, and against the plaintiff, Alex Medina. The defendants are AWARDED their costs to be taxed by the Clerk of theCourt pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. This case is DISMISSED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/16/2010.(sah, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Colorado Department of Corrections, Margaret (I) Heil, Margaret Heil be GRANTED and that this case be DISMISSED in its entirety by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/23/09. (kmtcd)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER. Having reviewed Plaintiffs submissions, it is apparent that Plaintiff has complied with the courts Order. Therefore, the courts 07/07/2009 Order 19 is DISCHARGED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/17/2009. (sah, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute ORDER granting 18 Motion to Clarify re: 18 Motion for Extension of Time to respond. Plaintiff shall file a Response to the Motion to Dismiss no later than August 13, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/23/09.(kmtcd)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs Request for Status of the Case by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/03/2009.(sah, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/08/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret (I) Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?