Collins v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: David L. Collins
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, Corrections Corporation of America, Aristedes Zavaras, Meryl Dohrmann, James Lander, J. D. Scollard, Marissa Schnell, Swartz and Puett
Case Number: 1:2008cv02657
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Kit Carson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 80 , and 82 Report and Recommendations; granting 41 Defendant Corrections Corporation of Americas Motion to Dismiss and all claims and causes of action against Defendant Corrections Corporation of America are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; granting 50 Colorado Department of Corrections and Defendants Aristedes W. Zavaras, Meryl Dohrmann, James, Lander, Jerie Scolland, and Elizabeth Schwartz Motion to Dismiss all claims and causes of action asserted against these Defe ndants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; It is FURTHER ORDERED that any remaining claims and causes of action asserted against Defendants Marissa Schnell, Puett and Sargent Rediesel are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Denying as moot 89 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause; by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/15/2010.(erv, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER denying 83 Plaintiffs Motion to Requse [sic] for the reasons set forth in this courts minute order dated 07/16/2009 66 . By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/23/2009.(sah, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Swartz, Colorado Department of Corrections, Aristedes Zavaras, Meryl Dohrmann, J. D. Scollard, James Lander, and 41 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Corrections Corporation of America be GRAN TED and that Defendants Corrections Corporation of America, Colorado Department of Corrections, Aristedes W. Zavaras, Meryl Dohrman, James Lander, Jerie Scollard and Elizabeth Schwartz be DISMISSED. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/2/09. (erv, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff's 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rediesel, Puett, Colorado Department of Corrections, Corrections Corporation of America, Aristedes Zavaras, Meryl Dohrmann, James Lander, J. D. Scollard, Marissa Schnell, Swartz and cause of action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/09. (kmtcd)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 66 Order on Motion for Ruling, by Plaintiff and 73 MOTION to Produce Documents by Plaintiff David L. Collins by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/21/09.(kmtcd)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 67 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff's Claims 24 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/4/09.(kmtcd)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Minute ORDER granting 60 Motion for Ruling Colorado Attorney Generals Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff seeks a ruling from this court as to whether theColorado Attorney General may represent the state defendants in this matter. The motion is GRANTED by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/09.(kmtcd)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Clarify by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/24/09.(erv, )
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/13/2009. (sah, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re: 18 Notice of Appeal filed by David L. Collins by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/20/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with the district court.(bjrsl, )
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/30/09.(jjh, )
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/21/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meryl Dohrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Scollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?