Stanko v. Davis et al
Petitioner: Rudy Stanko
Respondent: Blake Davis and Harley Lappin
Case Number: 1:2008cv02659
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 58 Notice of Appeal by Rudy Stanko, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/06/10. (bjrsl, )
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER accepting 45 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Rudy Stanko's 3 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 is denied and this case is dismissed. There is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/03/2010.(wjc, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER denying 34 Motion for Contempt in Violation of the Court's Order Dated 1/9/09, and denying 30 Motion for Contempt of Court, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/9/09.(ebs, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 18 Mr. Stanko's Motion to Compel. Mr. Stanko's Submission of Admissions, Document 20, is stricken, by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 1/28/09.(gmssl, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/09/2009. (sah, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Overruling Objection. Ordered that Applicant continues to have 20 days of the filing of the Preliminary Response in which to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 01/07/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanko v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudy Stanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Blake Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Harley Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?