Martinez v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gilbert W. Martinez
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv02664
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees in the amount of $2,632.50, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/23/09.(gmssl, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion to Remand. Civil action is ramanded to defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), as instructed in the order. Plaintiff may file application for attorney fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/30/09.(gmssl, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand. Parties to confer and submit an agreed briefing schedule no later than 6/15/09, by Judge John L. Kane on 6/3/09.(gmssl, )
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/8/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/8/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/23/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert W. Martinez
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?