Reynolds v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Reynolds
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2008cv02689
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 03/18/09. (jjh, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. Plaiantiff, within 30 days, to file amended complaint (re: 3 Complaint), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/20/09. (gms, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute ORDER denying as moot 9 Motion to Amend Complaint. To the extent on the 01/20/09, Motion, Plaintiff reuqests that the Court allow him to raise claims at a later date in the instant action, which currently are premature, the request is denied by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/21/09.(jjh, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Amend Original Complaint. The additional claim and requests for relief included in the Motion will not be considered by the Court. Order denying as premature 6 Motion for Discovery Documentation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 01/12/09.(jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?