Quinlisk v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Deborah Quinlisk
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv02694
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is ordered to pay the amount of $1,590.00 to plaintiff for attorney fees under the EAJA. EAJA attorney fee award to be made payable to plaintiff and mailed to plaintiff's attorney, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/1/10.(gmssl, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The January 18, 2007 decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for additional proceedings in accordance with this Order. Plaintiff may have her costs by filing a bill of costs within fourteen days of the date of this order, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/7/10. (gms, ) Modified on 1/11/2010 to correct typographical error (gms, ).
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/22/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/26/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/9/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/10/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinlisk v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Quinlisk
Represented By: Kenneth J. Shakeshaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?