Shoemaker v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Kelli L. Shoemaker
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv02714
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Conclusion of Commissioner through the Administrative Law Judge that plaintiff was not disabled is reversed. Case is remanded to the ALJ as directed in the order. Plaintiff is awarded her costs to be taxed by clerk, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/26/10. (gmssl, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion to Strike 16 Notice, by Judge John L. Kane on 10/7/09.(gmssl, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/9/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 12/7/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/21/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/30/09. (gmssl, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the 9 Order to Show Cause is temporarily discharged re: 10 . The instructions for preparation of the Joint Case Management Plan resent to the plaintiff as set forth in this Order. The Joint Case Management Plan shall be filed no later than 10/7/09, by Judge John L. Kane on 9/16/09. (lamsl, ) Modified on 9/18/2009 to correct filed date (lam, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoemaker v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli L. Shoemaker
Represented By: Britton Jess Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?