Jacquez-Ransom v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Judy J. Jacquez-Ransom
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2008cv02729
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AFFIRMING ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE'S DECISION. The ALJs denial of Plaintiffs applications for disability benefits is supported by substantial evidence in the record and free of legal error. Accordingly, the Commissioners decision is AFFIRMED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/18/2009. (sah, )
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Oral Argument set for 8/21/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/3/09. (gmssl, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 4/10/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 5/11/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/26/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 3/6/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacquez-Ransom v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy J. Jacquez-Ransom
Represented By: William Thomas Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?