Wolf v. Rogers, et al
Plaintiff: Philip Andrew Wolf
Defendant: Frederick Rogers, James Petrock and Anthony Peterson
Case Number: 1:2008cv02749
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Walker D. Miller
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED ORDER. Defendant's 70 Motion for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff for appellate attorney fees in the amount of $12,292.00, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/10/11. (mnf, )
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff for appellate attorney fees in the amount of $12,292.00, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/8/11.(mnf, )
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 58 Defendant James Petrock's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/2/10.(ebs, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Order. The Clerk shall enter Docket Nos. 51-3 through 51-8 as Defendant's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/23/09.(ebs, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 53 Notice of Appeal by Philip Wolf, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/17/09. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee or file a proper 1915 motion with district court.(bjrsl, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER accepting Report and Recommendation 41 . Granting 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice, converted to a Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Case is dismissed with prejudice, as barred by res judicata. Costs are awarded to defendant, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/19/09.(gms, )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 42 MOTION for Recusal, by Plaintiff Philip Andrew Wolf. (Document actually entitled "Plaintiff's Affidavit of Prejudice to Recuse U.S. Magistrate Tafoya, for Cause". By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/13/09.(kmtcd)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Defendant's 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED. Plaintiff's 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Philip Andrew Wolf be DENIED. This case be dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, as barred by res judicata; and costs be awarded to Defendant pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920 and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/24/09. (kmtcd)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/1/09. (ebs, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Rogers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Andrew Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Petrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?