American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Gustafson
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Barry G. Gustafson
Case Number: 1:2008cv02772
Filed: December 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING INPART MOTIONS TO AMEND JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Mr. Gustafson's 177 Motion to Substitute Pleading is GRANTED, and the Court deems his 168 Motion to Alter Judgment to be modified as set forth therein. The 168 Motion to Alter Judgment, as modified, is GRANTED, and the 167 Judgement is DEEMED AMENDED as of this date to award costs to Mr. Gustafson pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) (1) on the claims asserted against him. Mr. Gustafson's 169 Motion for Attorney's Fees is DENIED. American Family's 170 Motion to Alter Judgment is DENIED, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 02/10/2012.(wjc, )
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 101 Defendant and Counterclaimant Barry G. Gustafson's Motion to Amend Pleadings and to Add Request for Exemplary Damages. Defendant and Counterclaimant Barry G. Gustafson's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Amended Counterclaims [101-13] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order. That each party pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/10/2010.(mjwcd)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER granting 140 Defendant/counterclaimant's Motion to Renew the Unresolved Portion of the 132 Motion Set Forth Pursuant to the Direction of the Court at Status Conference Held on 04/15/2010. Defendant-Counterclaimant's 132 Partially Unopposed MOTION to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines to Allow 30(b)(6) Deposition of American Family and Opposed Motion to Compel American Family to Produce a Witness or Witnesses for its 30(b)(6) Deposition Pursuant [sic] Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(3)(B)(ii) is now GRANTED. Discovery due by 5/3/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 04/21/2010.(wjc, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Plaintiff and Counterdefendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Barry G. Gustafson's 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice as set forth in the Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/9/2010.(mjwcd)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Plaintiff and Counterdefendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Kathy Chaney, as set forth in the minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/2/10.(gms, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTE ORDER granting in part 98 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines Relating to Counterclaims, Dispositive Motions and Daubert Challenges. Discovery due by 2/12/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2010, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/28/2009.(wjc, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Parties' Stipulated Motion to Vacate Expert Disclosure Deadline and Set Telephonic Status Conference; Expert designation deadline of 8/31/2009 is vacated; parties shall contact the Court within 5 days to set a Telephonic Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/01/2009.(mjwcd )
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Include Counterclaims and Certificate of Compliance for the reasons stated in the subject motion and in the interest of justice. The Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims is accepted for filing as of the date of this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/29/2009.(wjc, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Withdraw al of Appearance. Jessica R. Torbin is allowed to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/06/2009.(wjc, )
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff American Family Insurance Company's Motion for Electronically Stored Information Discovery Plan. Each party shall pay for their own forensic expert for any work performed by their expert. Each party shall pay their own attorney fees and costs for this motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/10/09.(wjc, )
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/05/09. (wjc, )
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: 14 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite Discovery, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 02/02/09. (wjc, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/27/09. (mskcd)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/08/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent Donald Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry G. Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?