Barnhill v. Impact Sales, Inc.
Plaintiff: Steve Barnhill
Defendant: Impact Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2008cv02800
Filed: December 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/09. (jjh, )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Removing Case From the October 2, 2009, Calendar Call, re: 41 Notice. Dismissal Paper due by 10/15/2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re-setting Settlement Conference for 11/17/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/23/09. (jjh, )
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as set forth in this Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/17/09.(jjh, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute ORDER granting 33 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Settlement Conference. The Settlement conference currently scheduled for 06/30/09 is vacated. The parties shall place a conference call to chambers by 5:00 p.m. on 06/22/09 in order to reschedule the settlement conference. Plaintiff is Ordered to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 31 by 06/30/09 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/15/09.(jjh, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend Answer. The Clerk of the Court shall file the Amended Answer, hertofore attached to the motion as Exhibit C by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/15/09.(jjh, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 6/30/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/24/09. (jjh, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attonrey F.M. Saad and Attorney Alyssa Yatasko are relieved of any further respresentation of Defendant by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/06/09.(jjh, )
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3/24/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/07/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhill v. Impact Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Barnhill
Represented By: Brent Kristian Olsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Tarek Fathi M. Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?