Bassinger v. Wiley
Petitioner: Jesse Bassinger
Respondent: R. Wiley
Case Number: 1:2009cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 31 Petitioner's Motion Pursuant to 59(e) to Alter or Amend Judgment, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/9/11.(mnf, )
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER accepting 25 Recommendation. The respondent has complied with the magistrate judges recommendation that respondent be required to consider petitioner for placement in an RRC, in good faith and in accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3621(b), at his next review date. The objections of petitioner 26 are overruled. The Application 1 is dismissed as moot. There is no basis on which to issue a certificate of appealability pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c), by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/9/10.(ebs, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 1 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 be granted as directed in this recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/27/09. (ebs, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/05/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassinger v. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse Bassinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?