Boyd v. Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Boyd
Defendant: Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00013
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/4/09. (erv, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SECOND ORDER RE-SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference reset for 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/24/09. (kmtcd)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE-SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Settlement Conference Re-set for 9/18/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/17/09. (erv, )
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2009 01:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/11/09. (erv, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/06/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Boyd
Represented By: Joseph Rowland Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husqvarna Professional Outdoor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?