Highline Capital Corp. v. CMFEF Property Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Highline Capital Corp.
Defendant: CMFEF Property Holdings, LLC and Calvin Fowler
Case Number: 1:2009cv00042
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. The Court RECOMMENDs that the District Court grant 36 Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against CMFEF Property Holdings, LLC and Calvin Fowler Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/23/2009. (wjc, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Exhibits. The exhibits attached to the motion are admitted into evidence with respect to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2009. (mehcd)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2009, taking under advisement 25 Motion for Default Judgment. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/9/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of the order to the Defendants at the addresses listed on the docket, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/06/2009. (wjc, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 17 RECOMMENDATION, GRANTING 14 MOTION TO STRIKE, AND ENTERING DEFAULT. The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation 17 . The Plaintiffs Motion to Strike 14 is GRANTED, and the unsigned Answer 12 is STRICKEN pursuant to Fed . R. Civ. P. 11(a). Finding that service of process has been properly effected and there being no timely answer by the Defendants to the Amended Complaint, the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to enter the default of both Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/10/09.(wjc, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 04/02/09.(wjc, )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 14 Plaintiff's Verified MOTION to Strike Answer and for Entry of Default. Court recommends that the District Court grant Plaintiff's Verified Motion to Strike Answer and for Entry of Default, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 03/23/09. (wjc, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/28/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highline Capital Corp. v. CMFEF Property Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highline Capital Corp.
Represented By: Harvey L. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMFEF Property Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?