Kartiganer v. Newman et al
Plaintiff: Adam Kartiganer
Defendant: Bruce Newman, Derek Peters, Joe Bernal and Larry Baldonado
Case Number: 1:2009cv00050
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 107 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Order and Final Judgment by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/14/11.(jjhsl, )
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED re 100 Magistrate Judge Hegartys Report and Recommendations. granting 66 Defendants Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may have their costs by filing a bill of costs within eleven business days of the date of this Order. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/24/2010.(erv, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER granting 93 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial Conference. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2010 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/21/2010. (mehcd)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2010, denying 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Affidavit and Testimony of Defense Witness Paul Wiese; granting in p art and denying in part 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance and to Lift Stay of Discovery; denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Defendants, their Counsel and the Hall & Evans Law Firm. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Defendants' Motion to Vacate [and Reset] Motions Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2010 is RESET to 3/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. The Plaintiff, who resides out-of-state, may appear at the conference by telephone by calling my Chambers at (303) 844-4507 at the appointed time. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/9/2010. (mehcd)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 64 Defendants' Motion to Stay pending Determination of Entitlement to Qualified Immunity from Defendants. The parties shall file a status report within three business days of receiving a ruling on the CorrectedMotion for Summary Judgment, indicating what changes in the Scheduling Order are needed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2010. (mehcd)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs Requests for Admission by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/09.(erv, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs Requests for Admission for failure to comply with D.C. Colo. LCivR 7.1A.; In addition, Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel and Request for Sanction 37 on or before December 29, 2009. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/22/09.(erv, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify and Extend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/10/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26 2010 is VACATED and RESET to 5/24/2010 09:45 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/9/2009. (mehcd)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 25 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Denying as moot 14 Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Complaint, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment as to Defendant Newman; It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants shall file an answer or other response to the Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/18/09.(erv, )
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)), or in the Alternative, Motion For Summary Judgment as to Defendant Newman be denied as moot and that the Defendants file an answer or other response to the Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/1/09. (ebs, )
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Assign Case. Defendants Huerfano County, City of Walsenburg, Juab County, Alden Orme, Hoby Metz, The Fourth District Court of Utah, May Automotive Towing LLC, Utah State Tax Commission, Lee Allen Hawke, Diana Pacheco, The Third District Court of Colorado, and the Colorado Bureau of Investigation are dismissed from this action for the reasons stated above. The Clerk of Court shall remove Defendants Huerfano County, City of Walsenburg, Juab County, Alden Orme, Hoby Met z, The Fourth District Court of Utah, May Automotive Towing LLC, Utah State Tax Commission, Lee Allen Hawke, Diana Pacheco, The Third District Court of Colorado, and the Colorado Bureau of Investigation from the docketing record as parties to this action. The claims asserted against remaining Defendants Bruce Newman, larry Baldonado, Derek Peters, and Joe Bernal shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/19/2009. (sah, )
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a Complaint complete with addresses for all named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/9/2009. (llk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kartiganer v. Newman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Kartiganer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Newman
Represented By: David R. Brougham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Peters
Represented By: David R. Brougham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Bernal
Represented By: David R. Brougham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Baldonado
Represented By: David R. Brougham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?