Shop*TV, Inc. v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shop*TV, Inc.
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. and Eagle Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00057
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Patent Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims and Counterclaims 110 is APPROVED. This action is Dismissed With Prejudice with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/17/2010. (sah, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 (WITHDRAWN) ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 86 filed 01/19/2010, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART as an order of this court and is REJECTED IN PART. The Recommendation is APPROVED AND ADOPTED insofar asit recommends that defendants motion for summary judgment be granted as toplaintiffs First Claim for Relief for patent infringement. The Recommendation further is APPROVED AND ADOPTED insofar as it recommends that plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment be denie d. The Recommendation is respectfully REJECTED insofar as it recommends that defendants motion for summary judgment be denied as to plaintiffs Second Claim for Relief for trade dress infringement. Plaintiffs objections stated in Plaintiffs Objectio ns to the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 91 filed 01/29/2010are OVERRULED. Defendants objections stated in Defendants Objection toRecommended Decision 93 filed 01/29/2010, is OVERRULED IN PART andSUSTAINED IN PART. Defendants Mo tion for Summary Judgment 49 filed 10/30/2009 GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 50 filed 10/30/2009, is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/03/2010.(sah, ) Modified on 2/17/2010 to WITHDRAW pursuant to the Order dated 02/17/2010 (sah, ).
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 49 be GRANTED IN PART and summary judgment be entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff on the First Claim for Relief for pa tent infringement and DENIED IN PART on the Second Claim for Relief for trade dress infringement and that Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 50 be DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Declaratio n of Robert Chemtob [54-9] 61 is DENIED without prejudice as the court did not consider paragraphs 8-11 of Robert Chemtobs Second Declaration (doc. # 54-9) in evaluating ShopTVs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 01/19/2010. (sah, )
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2009 regarding # 49 Motion for Summary Judgment, # 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and # 61 Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Declaration of Robert Chemtob. Motions are taken under advisement by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 COURTROOM MINUTES - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/8/2009. ORDERED: Defendant's Unopposed, Combined Motion # 58 for (1) Leave to File a Supplement Brief in Oppos ition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; and (2) Leave to reopen the Depositions of Kenneth A. Bagus and Lee G. Meyer is GRANTED. ORDERED: A Motions Hearing is set for DECEMBER 18, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A40 2 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer to hear arguments on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 49 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 50 ; and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of the Second Declaration of Robert Chemtob (Dkt. 54-9), # 61 . ORDERED: A Settlement Conference is set for DECEMBER 18, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Confidential Updated Settlement Statements are due on or before DECEMBER 15, 2009 by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Court Reporter FTR - Linda Kahoe) (cbscd)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File SecondAmended Answer and Counterclaims. Defendants Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims (doc no. 43-2), tendered to the court on 10/29/2009, is accepted for filing as of the date of this order. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/30/2009.(sah, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 35 , filed 06/15/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. That U.S. Design Patent D564,219 is construed as follows: The design for a travel kit, used as a transparent, sealable receptacle for the included containers of specific configuration and volumetric capacity, as demonstrated in Figures 1 through 7. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/08/2009.(sah, )
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. That the 1 219 patent be construed as: "The design for a travel kit, used as a transparent, sealable receptacle for the included containers of specific configuration and volumetric capacity, as demonstrated in Figures 1 through 7". By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 06/15/2009. (sah, )
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Defendants Unopposed Motion to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Defendants Amended Answer and Counterclaims (doc no. 23-2), tendered to the court on 04/24/2009, is accepted for filing as of the date of this order by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/24/2009.(sah, )
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 04/10/2009. (sah, )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Five (5) Day Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/20/2009. (sah, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 3/20/2009 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 01/26/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shop*TV, Inc. v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shop*TV, Inc.
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?