Strong v. Yellow Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Letitia Strong
Defendant: Yellow Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00061
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying #31 Plaintif's Motion for Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/14/09.(erv, )
June 17, 2009 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal filed by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pages Attachment Unreported Cases)(Trim, Roger)
June 12, 2009 Filing 31 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff Letitia Strong. (Simon, Mark)
June 12, 2009 Filing 30 JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Yellow Transportation, Inc. against Letitia Strong re: #29 Order on Motion to Dismiss, It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 6/12/09. (erv, )
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, and the claims and causes of action set forth in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/12/09.(erv, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause in writing on or before Monday, June 8, 2009, indicating whether she intends to file a response to the motion to dismiss and, if so, an explanation as to why she failed to do so within the time frame provided by this Courts Local Rules of Practice. Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2009. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/4/09. (erv, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set on 07/07/2009, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED and RESET on 07/10/2009 at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom A-502, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 05/22/2009.(sah, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Unopposed MOTION to Reset /Reschedule Settlement Conference filed by Yellow Transportation, Inc..Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 5/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
May 20, 2009 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Reset /Reschedule Settlement Conference by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Moore, Steven)
May 1, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First #22 Amended Complaint by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Pages Unreported Cases, #5 Pages Unreported Cases)(Trim, Roger) (Modified on 5/4/2009 added link to Amended Complaint) (erv, ).
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #13 Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/21/09.(erv, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 22 DISMISSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yellow Transportation, Inc., filed by Letitia Strong.(erv, ) (Modified on 6/16/2009 DISMISSED )(erv, ).
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/20/09.(erv, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Letitia Strong.Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/17/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wydcd, rrk)
April 16, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Modify/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Letitia Strong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Amended Complaint & Jury Demand)(Simon, Mark) (Modified on 4/17/2009 added link)(erv, ).
April 15, 2009 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Letitia Strong. (Simon, Mark)
March 23, 2009 Filing 17 Courtroom Minutes/Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 3/23/2009. Discovery due by 10/30/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2009. Initial Expert Disclosures due by 8/30/2009. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/30/2009. Confidential Settlement Statements due by 7/1/2009. Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/25/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. (Court Reporter FTR - C. Coomes) (mehcd)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/30/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2009. Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2009 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/23/09. (wjc, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 15 Docket Annotation re: #14 Status Report. This document was filed in the wrong case. Counsel will re-file correctly in 08-cv-00673-PAB-KLM. Text only entry - no document attached (gms, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Lee, Lawrence)
March 20, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Attachment Unreported Cases)(Trim, Roger)
March 20, 2009 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Unreported Cases Attachment)(Trim, Roger)
March 16, 2009 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Lee, Lawrence)
March 4, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letitia Strong. Yellow Transportation, Inc. served on 2/10/2009, answer due 3/23/2009. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Simon, Mark)
March 2, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lawrence L. Lee on behalf of Yellow Transportation, Inc. (Lee, Lawrence)
February 26, 2009 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure Statement Pursuant to D.C.COLO.CivR 7.4 by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc... (Trim, Roger)
February 25, 2009 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by Defendant Yellow Transportation, Inc.. (Moore, Steven) (Modified on 2/26/2009 added link)(erv, ).
February 24, 2009 Filing 6 Docket Annotation re: #5 Affidavit/Return of Service, to be refiled as Summons Returned Executed. Text only entry - no document attached (erv, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of 02/20/09 upon Yellow Transportation, Inc. on 02/10/09, filed by Plaintiff Letitia Strong (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Simon, Mark)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/27/09. (gmssl, )
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/22/09. (Order was not attached to earlier entry).(wydcd, rrk)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Signed by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/22/09. (wydcd, rrk)
January 14, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & Jury Demand against Yellow Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX105822) Summons not issued, filed by Letitia Strong. (Attachments: #1 Exh to Compl, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(llk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Yellow Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia Strong
Represented By: Mark Andrew Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Steven W. Moore
Represented By: Lawrence L. Lee
Represented By: Roger Glenn Trim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?