Allsopp et al v. Akiyama, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erik Allsopp, Chad Strode, Brennan Bose, Chris Garrou, Nobuhiko Kishi and Jay Hathaway-Clark
Defendant: Akiyama, Inc., Zhu X. Judy Harris and Todd D. Harris
Case Number: 1:2009cv00063
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. The status conference set for Wednesday, November 3, 2010, at 2:30 p.m. is VACATED. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/25/2010.(erv, )
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 36 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment on State Law Claims. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants on the second and third claims for violations of the Colorado Minimum Wage Act, C.R.S. § 8-6-101, et seq., and the Colorado Wage Claim Act, C.R.S. § 8-4-101, et seq. The only remaining issue on these claims is the amount of damages owed to Plaintiffs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/26/2010.(erv, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re: 32 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, it is ORDERED that Defendant Akiyama, Inc., shall obtain counsel no later than December 14, 2009. Rule 16(f) provides in pertinent part that [o]n motion or on its own, the court may issue any ju st orders, including those authorized by Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(ii)- (vii), if a party... (C) fails to obey a scheduling or other pretrial order. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(vi) permits the court to render a default judgment against the disobe dient party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(A)(vi). If Defendant Akiyama, Inc., has not obtained counsel by December 14, 2009, the court will recommend default judgment against it and in favor of Plaintiffs. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/13/09. (erv, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/2/09. (wydcd, rrk)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER re: 32 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants, Attorney Christine Kessler Lamb and Attorney Stephen M. DeHoff, terminated. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/09. (erv, )
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 4/24/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/15/09. (erv, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. A Scheduling and Planning Conference is set for 4/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/06/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allsopp et al v. Akiyama, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Allsopp
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Strode
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brennan Bose
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Garrou
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nobuhiko Kishi
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Hathaway-Clark
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akiyama, Inc.
Represented By: Christine Kessler Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhu X. Judy Harris
Represented By: Christine Kessler Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?