Stavaski v. Sun Microsystems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Stavaski
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc. and David Profozich
Case Number: 1:2009cv00077
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice 116 is APPROVED. The jury trial set to commence on 03/22/2010 is VACATED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 03/12/2010. (sah, )
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER : This case has been resolved. On or before March 9, 2010, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/9/10. (bnbcd, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2010 04:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Settlement Conference set for 2/9/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/2/10. (bnbcd, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 81 Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from DefendantSun Microsystems, Inc. Granting in part and denying in part 89 Joint Motion to Continue All Existing Deadlines By 30 Days. Dispositive Motions extended to and including 1/18/2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/11/10.(bnbcd, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re: Denying 67 First MOTION to Strike Non-Rebuttal Provisions of Jory Laine's October 30, 2009 Expert Report for Untimeliness filed by Mark Stavaski. The plaintiff shall designate a rebuttal expert on the issue of mitigation of damages a nd provide opposing counsel with all information specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) on or before January 8, 2010. Discovery is reopended to and including January 20, 2010, solely to allow the defendants to depose plaintiffs rebuttal expert on the issue of mitigation of damages, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/7/09. (bnbcd, )
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 55 defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Fifth Claim for Relief. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/23/2009.(sah, )
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 60 Plaintiffs Second Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept for filing the Second Amended Complaint [60-3]. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/20/2009.(sah, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Plaintiffs Unopposed Request For Leave To Submit a Conforming Response To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Relief 55 filed 11/09/2009. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/12/2009.(sah, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: The plaintiff may serve seven additional interrogatories; serve five additional requests for production of documents; and take five additional depositions. The defendants may reopen the plaintiffs deposition and inquire for an additional four hours, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/30/09. (bnbcd, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: granting re: 34 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Mark Stavaski, denying 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Scheduling Order to Allow Supplementation of Expert Reports filed by Mark Stavaski. The Clerk o f the Court is directed to accept for filing the Amended Complaint [Doc. # 34-4]. Discovery due by 1/15/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2010. Status Conference set for 9/30/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/25/09. (bnbcd, )
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Plaintiffs Request to Amend Briefing Schedule for Pending Motion to Amend Complaint. The hearing set for 09/24/2009, is vacated and reset to 09/25/2009, at 1:30 p.m., for one hour, in Courtroom A-401. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 09/11/2009.(sah, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Seven (7) day Jury Trial set for 3/22/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/10/09. (rebsec, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART 19 Plaintiffs Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Personnel Files filed by Mark Stavaski. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/6/09. (erv, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF RECUSAL directing reassignment to another judge. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 07/27/2009. (sah, )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/223/2009. (sah, )
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/06/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stavaski v. Sun Microsystems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stavaski
Represented By: Lisa R. Sahli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon McFarland Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Profozich
Represented By: Shannon McFarland Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?