Werner v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Gary Werner
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Interested Party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2009cv00087
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion For Attorney Fees Under EAJA. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, attorney fees under EAJA in the amount of $4,065.60, to the Plaintiff, in care of the Plaintiffs attorney. By Judge John L. Kane on 09/03/2009.(sah, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion to Remand; granting 20 Motion for Order to Change ALJ on Remand. This civil action is remanded to defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Upon remand, claim to be assigned to an ALJ who did not previously hear the matter, by Judge John L. Kane on 7/28/09.(gms, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases (ORDER) SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 6/10/2009. SS Defendants Brief due by 7/10/2009. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/27/2009, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/29/09. (gmssl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werner v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Werner
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?