Elizalde v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elvia Elizalde
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00096
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: the Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice 19 filed 04/29/2009 is APPROVED. The Trial Preparation Conference set for 02/05/2010 is VACATED. The jury trial set to commence 02/22/2010, is VACATED. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/04/2009. (sah, )
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Four (4) Day Jury Trial set for 2/22/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 2/5/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 04/16/2009. (sah, )
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/07/2009. (sah, )
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, A Settlement Conference is set for 4/16/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom C205. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/21/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizalde v. Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvia Elizalde
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?