Saunders v. Wilner et al
Plaintiff: John Saunders
Defendant: J. (I) M. Wilner, J. M. Wilner, Dave (I) Gruders and Dave Gruders
Case Number: 1:2009cv00114
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 104 is GRANTED. Any pending motion is DENIED as moot. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/08/2010. (sah, )
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion for An Order Compelling Discovery ( 50 is DENIED without prejudice. Defendants are ORDERED to submit responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission no later than 05/14/2010. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 0415/2010.(sah, )
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 77 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Caption Complaint (Actually entitled: Amendment/or Substitution to Replace Defendants') by Plaintiff. Plaintiffs Complaint and caption shall be amended to substitute Warden JulieWands as a defen dant in place of Defendant Warden Wilner, and to substitute Chaplain Mike Merrill as a defendant in place of Defendant Dave Grooters. Defendants shall file a supplemental response to Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Compelling Discovery 50 no later t han 4/20/2010. Defendants specificallyshall address their duty to respond to the discovery requests in light of the substituted defendants and in light of this courts recommendation, and Judge Blackburns order adopting the recommendation, that sovereign immunity does not bar Plaintiffs claims for injunctive relief against the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/13/2010.(kmtcd, )
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/21/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall arrange for Plaintiff to be available toparticipate by telephone in the conference, by having the Plaintiff and/or his case manager call this court at 303-335-2780 at the appointed date and time by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/8/2010. (kmtcd, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 37 filed 08/25/2009, is APPROVED AND ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Defendants Motion To Dismiss 17 filed 04/20/2009, is GRANTED as to all claims against defendants Wilner and Gruders in their individual capacities and as to all claims for compensatory damages against defendants Wilner and Gruders in their official capacities. All claims against defendants Wilner and Gruders in their individual capacities and all claims for compensatory damages against defendants Wilner and Gruders in their official capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Otherwise, the Defendants Motion To Dismiss 17 filed 04/20/2009 is DENIED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 02/18/2010.(sah, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. A Preliminary Scheduling Conference is set for 12/3/2009 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/29/2009. (sah, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants J. (I) M. Wilner, J. M. Wilner, Dave (I) Gruders, Dave Gruders be GRANTED. All claims against Defendants Wilner and Gruders, in their individual capacities, be DISMISSED with prejudic e. All claims for compensatory damages against Defendants Wilner and Gruders, in their official capacities, be DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED to the extent the Motion seeks dismissal of Claims One, Two and Three for injunctive relief underthe First Amendment and the RFRA against Defendants Wilner and Gruders, in their official capacities. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/25/09. (kmtcd)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Plaintiffs letter docketed as a motion to have the parties provide copies of everything filed. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/18/2009.(sah, )
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER. Petitioners Motion to Postpone Case, and to Stay the Course 19 , filed 04/27/2009. To the extent Plaintiff moves to stay proceedings, his motion is DENIED. The Plaintiff is granted an extension up to and including 06/30/2009, to file his response to the motion to dismiss by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/29/2009.(sah, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/05/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Wilner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. (I) M. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. M. Wilner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave (I) Gruders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Gruders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?