Williams v. Aurora, City of et al
Plaintiff: Duane Williams
Defendant: Aurora, City of, Aurora Police Department, Michael Minisini, Michael (I) Minisini, Douglas Wilkinson and Douglas (I) Wilkinson
Case Number: 1:2009cv00121
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Dismissing Defendant City of Aurora With Prejudice. Each party to pay their own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/21/10. (jjh, )
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Dismissing Defendants Minisini and Wilkinson. Order Granting the Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of all Claims Against Defendants Minisini and Wilkinson and Amend Caption 49 . each party to pay their own attorneys fees and costs, and the case caption will be amended to more accurately reflect the parties involved in this case by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 04/20/10.(jjh, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Amend Complaint, signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/29/2009.(rpmcd)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. ORDERED that the dispositive motion deadline is extended to and including 11/13/09 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/30/09.(jjh, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 4/16/2010 02:00 PM in Conference Room and Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4:00 p.m., 4/8/2010. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/2/2009. (rpmcd)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/12/2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2009.(rpmcd)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Modify Scheduling Orders ( 8 and 25 ). Expert Designation Deadline is extended to and including November 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/31/2009.(rpmcd)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Modify 8 Scheduling Order. Rebuttal Expert Deadline is extended to and including August 28, 2009. Discovery due by 10/13/2009. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/14/2009.(rpmcd)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to Comply With D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 re: 22 Protective Order. All court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under seal based on the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/3/2009. (rpmcd)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Ordered that the motion is granted and the Scheduling Order is modified to reflect an expert designation deadline of 06/26/09 by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 06/19/09.(jjh, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Amend Complaint re: 10 . Amended Complaint and Jury Demand tendered as Document #10 is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/30/2009.(rpmcd)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 3/18/2009 11:00 AM in Conference Room before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 01/30/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aurora, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Williams
Represented By: William W. Frankfurt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora, City of
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Police Department
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minisini
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Minisini
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Wilkinson
Represented By: Julia A. Bannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas (I) Wilkinson
Represented By: Michael Turner Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?