Cook v. Zavaras
Petitioner: John H. Cook
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras
Case Number: 1:2009cv00136
Filed: January 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal after Review re 22 Notice of Appeal by John H. Cook, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 07/29/09. (bjrsl, )
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the habeas corpus application is denied and the action is dismissed as barred by the one-year limitation period by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 06/23/09. (jjh, )
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Ordered that within 20 days Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response. Ordered that within 20 days of the filing of the Pre-Answer Response Applicant may file a Reply by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/05/09. (jjh, )
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency. Applicant has 30 days to file and account statement that is certified by a prison official by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/22/2009. (llk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John H. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?