Waters v. Durango Fire and Rescue Authority
Plaintiff: Larry L. Waters
Defendant: Durango Fire and Rescue Authority
Case Number: 1:2009cv00272
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/2/10.(ebs, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 31 Defendant Durango Fire and Rescue Authority's Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. Defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs pursuant to Local Rule 54.1. Denying as moot 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief, by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/16/09.(ebs, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 67 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Re-Set Settlement Conference. The Settlement Conference set for 12/14/09 is vacated. Denying as moot 65 Defendant's Motion for Permission to Have Insurance Representative Appear at the Settlement Conference by Telephone, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/10/09.(ebs, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/9/2009. (mjwcd)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Of Recusal. Magistrate Judge West is recused. Clerk to assign another magistrate judge by random draw by Magistrate Judge David L. West on 05/14/2009. (sah, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/23/09. (ebs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Durango Fire and Rescue Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry L. Waters
Represented By: Michael David Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durango Fire and Rescue Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?