Banks v. Hodak
Plaintiff: George Banks
Defendant: Hodak
Case Number: 1:2009cv00285
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: David M. Ebel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute ORDER denying 147 "Motion of Show Cause Hold Payment Until Released," by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/15/12.(lygsl, )
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER. Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiffs Affidavit in Support of a Dismissal of Payment [sic] 136 which the court will interpret as a motion to stop making payments to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals for payment owing to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/20/2010.(sah, )
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER to Cure Deficiency re 121 Notice of Appeal by George Banks, by Judge David M. Ebel on 02/03/10. Appellant has 30 days to either pay the filing fee to district court or file a proper 1915 motion.(bjrsl, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. The Court finds no clear error on the face of the record, and adopts in full Magistrate Judge Watanabes recommendation 108 . Therefore, Defendants Motion to Dismiss which was converted into a motion for summary judgment 58 is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety, including any pending motions, and judgment shall be entered accordingly. By Judge David M. Ebel on 01/15/2010.(sah, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER denying 105 Motion for Outside Medical Exam. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/19/2009.(sah, )
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RECOMMENDATION By United States Magistrate Judge. It is RECOMMENDED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss 58 , which was converted to a motion for summary judgment, BE GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/18/2009. (sah, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER: DENYING 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; and DENYING 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; Plaintiff does not appear to be seeking any specific relief from the court in these documents, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/9/2009.(mjwcd )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint 58 is hereby converted to a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. Denying 94 Plaintiff's Motion to Face to Face Request to Talk to the Court, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/6/09.(gmssl, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Medical Evaluation for the reasons stated in this court's Minute Order of 9/28/2009, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/5/2009.(mjwcd )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER Denying 77 Motion This Court, denying 86 Motion this Court and denying 73 Motion Administration Notice. Denying 80 Motion for Medical Evaluation, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/28/09.(gmssl, )
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER In order for the court to issue an order or recommendation on 73 Plaintiff's Motion Administration Notice filed by George Banks, the court orders that by 9/25/2009 Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the motion, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/04/2009. (mjwcd)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER denying 70 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for Legal Relief, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/31/09.(gms, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER denying 59 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 241 and 242 For Criminal Investigation and Indictment, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 07/28/2009.(mjwcd )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion for Criminal Proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/20/09.(gms, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Status of Case Under Common Law. The clerk shall send a copy of the docket to the plaintiff with this minute order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/16/09.(gmssl, )
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration to Appoint Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/09.(gms, )
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Minute ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration to Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/22/09.(gms, )
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/02/2009. (sah, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER denying 5 Motion the Courthouse. Order denying 6 Motion the Court by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/27/09.(jjh, )
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Clerk to Commence Civil Action and Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. Plaintiff has 30 days to submit a Prisoner Complaint, and all copies must be identical to the original by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/10/2009. (llk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Hodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hodak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?