Kemp v. Zavaras et al
Plaintiff: Glenn H. Kemp
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras, Kevin Milyard, Beverly Dowis, Brian Webster, Gatbel Chamjock, Chris Wade, T. Tarver and Anthony A. DeCesaro
Case Number: 1:2009cv00295
Filed: February 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER sustainng in part 182 Glen Kemp's Motion To Award Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $48,003.00 in attorney's fees. By Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 11/18/13.(mnfsl, )
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, and approved by Judge Kathryn H. Vratil, re: 177 Jury Trial - Completed. By Clerk on 11/7/12. (mnfsl, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER and Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff Glenn Kemp re: 154 Unopposed MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum filed by Glenn H. Kemp. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/29/12. (alvsl)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER. 140 Defendants motion in limine is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as described in the order; 157 Plaintiffs motion for issue preclusion is DENIED; 158 Defendants cross motion for claim preclusion is DENIED by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/26/12. (alvsl)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Defendant Tarver and Defendant Wades 134 motion for summary judgment is DENIED; Defendant Webster and Defendant Chomjocks motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; Defendant Dowiss motion for summary judgment is DENIED, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/16/2012.(ervsl, )
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) no later than 45 days after all responsive pleadings are filed. Please see order for details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/16/2011. (rbjsec.)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER granting 98 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/24/11.(lsw, )
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 93 Motion to Amend Complaint by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 06/14/11.(jjh, )
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 84 is AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED. Ordered that Defendants Wade and Tarvers Motion to Dismiss the Second Amend ed Complaint 76 be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is GRANTED to the extent that the Plaintiffs official capacity claims for damages and declaratory relief be dismissed with prejudice; and it is DENIED in all other respects. ORDERED that Defendants Wade and Tarvers Objections to the Recommendation of February 17, 2011 85 are OVERRULED by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/22/11.(jjh, )
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Defendant Websters Motion to Withdraw his Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, withdrawing 50 Motion to Dismiss; by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/18/2010.(erv, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER granting 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Pleadings; granting 58 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. It is thus further ORDERED that on or before June 6, 2010, the plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint which incorporates his Supplement to the Amended Complaint 54 at [4-9] into his tendered Second Amended Complaint [58-1]. Once plaintiff does so, the Amended Complaint will no longer be the operative pleading. Therefore, after the Second Amended Complai nt is filed by plaintiff as directed by this court in this Minute Order, defendant Webster shall advise the court whether he will be withdrawing his Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint 50 . by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/20/2010.(erv, )
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion for Order for Equitable Tolling and Acceptance of Objection and Response to Motion to Dismiss. Consequently, plaintiffs Objection to Minute Order Denying Motion to Strike 61 and plaintiffs Response to Websters Motion to Dismiss 62 are accepted as timely filed. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/4/2010.(erv, )
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER denying 53 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defense Counsel's Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Brian Webster, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/5/2010.(mjwcd)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REJECTED IN PART AND ACCEPTED IN PART 45 Magistrate Judge Watanabes Report and Recommendations; Granting in part and Denying in part 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/29/2010.(erv, )
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney General to Provide the Address of Non-Served Defendant to the Court Under Seal. Defense counsel is granted leave to file defendant Brian Webster's last known address to the court under seal, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/30/2009.(mjwcd )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by United States Marshal, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/5/2009.(mjwcd )
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Defense Counsel's Motion to Withdraw Appearance and Motion to Dismiss on Behalf of Defendant Brian Webster. Senior Assistant Attorney General Patrick L. Sayas is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Defendant Brian Webs ter. Defendant Brian Webster is stricken from theDefendants 18 Motion to Dismiss. Pro Se Incarcerated Plaintiff shall forthwithserve Defendant Brian Webster with the summons and complaint, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/01/09.(wjc, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Service by the United States Marshal re: 10 Amended Complaint filed by Glenn H. Kemp by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/8/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 6/10/2009 corrected typo) (erv, ).
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Drawing Case. Ordered that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/03/2009. (sah, )
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/23/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemp v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn H. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Milyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatbel Chamjock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?