Schwartz v. Ploughe
Petitioner: Robert Schwartz
Respondent: Pamela Ploughe
Case Number: 1:2009cv00326
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AFFIRMED AND ADOPTED 25 United States Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffers Report and Recommendations; Granting 22 Respondents Motion to Dismiss as Moot; Petitioners action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as moot. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/4/2010.(erv, )
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 Mr. Schwartz Request for Release from Incarceration by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/14/09.(erv, )
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and to Assign Case. Ordered that the application is denied to the extent Mr. Schwartz is challenging any decisions of the parole board's decision of May 28, 2008. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 04/16/2009. (sah, )
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to File Preliminary Response. Within 20 days respondent to file a Preliminary Response. Applicant may file a reply within 20 days of filing of the Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/20/09. (gms, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. Ploughe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pamela Ploughe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?