Rossetti Associates, Inc. v. Santa Fe 125 Denver, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rossetti Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Santa Fe 125 Denver, LLC, JFA Management, LLC, Joseph Freed and Associates, LLC and Cherokee Denver, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00338
Filed: February 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER and Entry of Judgment granting 104 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Remaing Claim for negligent misrepresentation is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Each party shall pay its own costs and attorneys fees incurred herein; This Order shall constitute a final judgment for all purposes; It is SO ordered. by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/31/2011.(erv, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Minute Entry for Trial Preparation Conference held before Judge William J. Martinez: ORDERED: The Proposed Motion for Leave to File Motion in Limine 83 is DENIED. The motion was filed late and there was no attempt to demonstrate good cause as to w hy it failed to comply with this Court's Practice Standards. ORDERED:Plaintiff shall submit a written proffer on or before March 23, 2011 as to (1) the precise amount of damages it will be seeking at trial on the negligent misrepresentation clai m; (2) how it intends to prove up those damages; and (3) an analysis of how those damages comport with the relevant case law limiting the monetary relief on negligent misrepresentation tort claims in Colorado. On or before March 28, 2011 the Defenda nts shall file their response to said proffer. ORDERED: Regarding voir dire, counsel have 15 minutes per side. ORDERED: Regarding the appropriateness of the proposed voir dire questions RULING IS RESERVED for trial. ORDERED: On or before Friday, Ma rch 25, 2011 counsel shall submit a stipulated statement of the case jury instruction, making it as simple as possible. ORDERED: RULING IS RESERVED on the proposed jury instructions and verdict form until trial. ORDERED: Defendants are permitted to submit a verdict form with respect to Defendant Santa Fe which it inadvertently omitted in its submissions to the Court. The Court is inclined to give a jury instruction on the elements of the claim of negligent misrepresentation which follows Bedard v. Martin, 100 P.3d 584 (Colo. App. 2004). ORDERED: Plaintiff's proposed punitive damage jury instruction is WITHDRAWN. (Court Reporter: Gwen Daniel) (ltbcd, )
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 plaintiff Rossettis Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 68 Santa Fe, JFA, and JFA Managements Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/4/2011.(erv, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and to file a Joint Status Report, Status Report due 2/23/2011 by Judge William J. Martinez on 02/14/11. (jjh, )
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/3/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/16/09. (msksec, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/2/09. (mskcd)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/26/09. (wjc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossetti Associates, Inc. v. Santa Fe 125 Denver, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossetti Associates, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe 125 Denver, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JFA Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Freed and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Denver, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?