Carman v. Qwest Communications Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Angela Carman
Defendant: Qwest Communications Corporation and Communication Workers of America Local 7743
Case Number: 1:2009cv00368
Filed: February 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party topay her or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/12/09. (erv, )
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Complaint by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/13/09.(erv, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re: 25 Defendant Qwest Communications Corporations Amended MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/27/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. Qwest Communications Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communication Workers of America Local 7743
Represented By: Stanley Miller Gosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?