Williams v. M & T Bank
Plaintiff: Karene'e Williams
Defendant: M & T Bank
Case Number: 1:2009cv00369
Filed: February 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 254 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document, #3 Exhibit) Stricken pursuant to 185 Order(evana, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 253 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (evana, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 252 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (evana, )
December 24, 2020 Filing 251 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 250 STRICKEN LETTER by Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (evana, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 249 STRICKEN LETTER by Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (evana, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 248 STRICKEN LETTER with attachments by Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (evana, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 247 STRICKEN - LETTER by Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (evana, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 246 STRICKEN LETTER by Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (evana, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 245 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, ) Modified on 12/24/2019 to correct filing date (athom, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 244 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, ) Modified on 12/24/2019 to correct text (athom, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 243 STRICKEN - LETTER - by from Karene'e Williams (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Part 2 of 2) (Stricken pursuant to 185 Order)(evana, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 242 STRICKEN - LETTER - by Plaintiff Karene's Williams. (Stricken pursuant to 185 Order) (evana, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 241 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stricken pursuant to 185 Order)(evana, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 240 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Stricken pursuant to 185 Order) (evana, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 239 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 238 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 237 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 236 STRICKEN - NOTICE by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 235 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 234 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Additional Pages) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 233 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 232 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 231 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 230 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 229 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 228 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 227 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 226 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 225 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, ) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add text (athom, ).
October 31, 2018 Filing 224 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 223 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 222 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 221 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (evana, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 220 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (evana, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 219 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 218 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 217 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order (dkals, ) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add text (athom, ).
August 23, 2018 Filing 216 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order.(evana, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 215 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 214 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 213 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. $20 Cashier's Check made payable to the court that was filed with document has been returned to Plaintiff at the address that is listed on the attached envelope. (athom, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 212 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 211 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 210 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
July 6, 2018 Filing 209 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 208 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 207 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 27, 2018 Filing 206 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 205 STRICKEN - LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 204 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 203 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 12, 2018 Filing 202 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 8, 2018 Filing 201 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 200 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 199 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 31, 2018 Filing 198 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 25, 2018 Filing 197 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 196 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 195 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 194 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 193 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 192 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (dkals, ) Modified on 5/9/2018 to add text (athom, ).
April 26, 2018 Filing 191 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 23, 2018 Filing 190 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 189 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 188 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 187 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 11, 2018 Filing 186 STRICKEN - LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) stricken pursuant to 185 Order. (athom, )
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims were dismissed on 6/20/2011, Final Judgment was entered on 6/21/2011, and the case was closed. This Court has no further jurisdiction in this matter, therefore, the Plaintiff shall cease filing papers in this case. Any further papers filed by the Plaintiff in this case will be stricken without further notice. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/3/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
March 29, 2018 Filing 184 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 183 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
March 21, 2018 Filing 182 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 181 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
February 26, 2018 Filing 180 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 179 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 30, 2018 Filing 178 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 177 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 18, 2018 Filing 176 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 17, 2018 Filing 175 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 16, 2018 Filing 174 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 173 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 172 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (athom, )
January 2, 2018 Filing 171 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
December 26, 2017 Filing 170 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (athom, )
November 24, 2017 Filing 169 Letter by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (evana, )
November 17, 2017 Filing 168 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Exhibits) (athom, )
November 14, 2017 Filing 167 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
November 13, 2017 Filing 166 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 165 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
November 7, 2017 Filing 164 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
November 3, 2017 Filing 163 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
November 1, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 161 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 160 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #155 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 159 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (athom, )
October 13, 2017 Filing 158 NOTICE by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Exhibit)(cthom, )
October 12, 2017 Filing 157 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #153 Letter Addressed to Karene's Williams. (cthom, )
October 12, 2017 Filing 156 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #151 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (cthom, )
October 3, 2017 Filing 155 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
October 2, 2017 Filing 154 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #152 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
September 25, 2017 Filing 153 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
September 22, 2017 Filing 152 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
August 24, 2017 Filing 151 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
August 18, 2017 Filing 150 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
August 18, 2017 Filing 149 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
August 16, 2017 Filing 148 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #147 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
August 4, 2017 Filing 147 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
July 20, 2017 Filing 146 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
July 17, 2017 Filing 145 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
July 12, 2017 Filing 144 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
July 10, 2017 Filing 143 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Please note that there was no Page 10 included in this filing. (athom, )
July 5, 2017 Filing 142 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams.(jgonz, )
June 26, 2017 Filing 141 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
June 16, 2017 Filing 140 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (athom, )
June 14, 2017 Filing 139 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
June 1, 2017 Filing 138 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
May 24, 2017 Filing 137 Copy of LETTER to FDIC by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 136 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits to #135 Letter by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 135 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
May 22, 2017 Filing 134 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #131 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
May 1, 2017 Filing 133 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 132 NOTICE of Change of Contact Information by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
April 19, 2017 Filing 131 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
March 7, 2017 Filing 130 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #129 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
February 13, 2017 Filing 129 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (athom, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 128 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 123 Order on Motion for Order, Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 127 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #122 Notice (Other) Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 126 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #121 MOTION for Order to Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 12, 2017 Filing 125 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #118 Addendum II Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 12, 2017 Filing 124 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #117 Letter, 116 Case Reassigned, #115 Letter Addressed to Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER: Plaintiff's claims were dismissed on 6/20/2011, Final Judgment was entered on 6/21/2011, and the case was closed. This Court has no further jurisdiction in this matter, therefore, Plaintiff's #121 Motion is STRICKEN. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/11/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 10, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
January 5, 2017 Filing 121 STRICKEN by Doc. 123 Letter motioning the court by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom) Modified on 1/11/2017 (cmasec).
December 30, 2016 Filing 120 Letter by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams, Counter Defendant Karene'e Williams (cthom, )
December 19, 2016 Filing 119 ADDENDUM III by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (evana, )
December 16, 2016 Filing 118 Addendum II by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
December 15, 2016 Filing 117 Letter re #115 Letter by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (athom, )
December 15, 2016 Filing 116 CASE REASSIGNED. This case is reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 09-cv-00369-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 115 LETTER by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(cthom, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 114 FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant M & T Bank, as successor by merger to M & T Mortgage Corporation, and against Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. Each party shall pay its own costs and attorneys' fees. This civil action and Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. By Clerk on 6/21/11. (mnf, )
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The #111 Order to Show Cause is discharged. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay her or its own costs and attorneys' fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 06/20/2011. (wjc, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 112 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #111 by Defendant M & T Bank. (Kitaev, Erica)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by the parties why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice with each party to pay its own costs. Show Cause Response due by 6/17/2011. By Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/2/11. (mnf, )
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER ON RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The #109 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland is accepted. Plaintiff's #86 Motion to Rescind Settlement Agreement is denied, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 11/02/2010.(wjc, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 109 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #86 Plaintiff's MOTION to Rescind Settlement Agreement be denied, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/5/10. (ebs, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 09/20/2010 before Magistrate Judge Boland. Pages: 1-58. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (Avery Woods Reporting, )
September 20, 2010 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Evidentiary Hearing held on 9/20/2010.The plaintiffs motion to rescind settlement agreement #81 [ Doc #86 ; filed 6/24/10] is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT, as stated in record. The Court will file a recommendation. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei) (Attachments: #1 witness & exhibit list, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 witness & exhibit list, #4 Exhibit B & C) (bnbcd, ) Modified on 9/21/2010 to create linkage (ebs, ).
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #102 Defendant's Motion to Allow Witness Paul Kucinski to Appear By Telephone, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/17/10.(ebs, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2010. Defendants motion to allow witness Paul Kucinski to appear by telephone [Doc. #102 ; filed 9/14/10] is granted as stated on the record. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei) (bnbcd, ) Modified on 9/20/2010 to create linkage (ebs, ).
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #102 Defendants Motion to Allow Witness Paul Kucinski to Appear by Telephone: A telephonic hearing on this Motion is set for September 17, 2010, at 10:00 a.m.before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Defense counsel will initiate a conference call and will call Chambers at 303/844- 6408 at the appropriate time, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/15/10. (bnbcd, )
September 15, 2010 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM regarding #102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Telephonic Testimony of Paul Kucinski filed by M & T Bank.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/15/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion for Telephonic Testimony of Paul Kucinski by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Kitaev, Erica)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MINUTE ORDER: granting #99 Unopposed Motion to Request Copies of Settlement Conference Transcripts. The Clerk of the Court is directed to retain UNDER SEAL copies of the settlement conference transcripts once they have been entered into the record, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/4/10.(bnbcd, )
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM regarding #99 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Request Copies of Settlement Conference Transcripts filed by M & T Bank.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 8/4/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Request Copies of Settlement Conference Transcripts by Defendant M & T Bank. (Kitaev, Erica)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER : The Pretrial Conference previously set for December 8, 2010, isVACATED, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/3/10. (bnbcd, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER : The evidentiary hearing is reset to September 20, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. All proposed exhibit and witness lists and any hearing briefs, if necessary, are now due September 13, 2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/26/10. (bnbcd, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER : Evidentiary Hearing reset for 9/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/26/10. (bnbcd, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 95 Docket Annotation re: #94 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. This docket entry was modified to add text to indicate the document is a Minute Order. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #86 MOTION for Order to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 : Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Counsel shall submit to my chambers, on or before August 4, 2010, proposed witness lists, exhibit lists, original and two copies of all exhibits, and hearing briefs, if necessary, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/15/10. (bnbcd, ) Modified on 7/16/2010 to add text to indicate the document is a Minute Order (ebs, ).
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Minute ORDER granting #89 Unopposed Motion to Seal Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Rescind Settlement agreement. Clerk of the Court will retain docket no. 90 under seal, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/14/10.(lyg, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM regarding #89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 filed by M & T Bank. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/2/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(ebs, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 91 RESPONSE to #86 MOTION to Rescind Settlement Agreement, filed by Defendant M & T Bank. (Public entry for #90 Sealed Document filed 7/1/10). Text only entry - no document attached. (ebssl, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant M & T Bank. (Kitaev, Erica)
July 1, 2010 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kitaev, Erica)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER re: #86 MOTION to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 . Defendant shall respond to the Motion on or before 7/9/10. No reply will be accepted without leave of court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/25/10. (ebs, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM regarding #86 MOTION for Order to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 filed by Karene'e Williams. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/24/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, ) Modified on 6/25/2010 to delete duplicate text generated by the system (ebs, ).
June 24, 2010 Filing 86 MOTION for Order to Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams, Counter Defendant Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FNMA Announcement 08-16, 6-25-08, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Karene'e Williams, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion To Rescind Settlement Agreement #81 )(Janiszewski, Steven)
June 9, 2010 Filing 85 Docket Annotation re: #84 Order on Motion to Stay. This docket entry was modified to correct the file date. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: granting #82 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Pending the Resolution of Settlement. Discovery and the requirements to make expert disclosures are STAYED pending further order of the court, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/7/10.(bnbcd, ) Modified on 6/9/2010 to correct the file date (ebs, ).
June 2, 2010 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM regarding #82 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Resolution of Settlement filed by M & T Bank.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/2/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 82 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending The Resolution of Settlement by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kitaev, Erica)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: Consistent with matters discussed today at a status conference, Dismissal Paper due by 7/19/2010, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/10. (ebs, )
April 22, 2010 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Supplemental Settlement Negotiations were held on 4/22/2010. Record was made. (ebs, )
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER granting #75 Motion to Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Status Report. The Clerk shall retain docket entry no. 74 under seal, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/22/10.(ebs, )
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER granting #71 Unopposed Motion to Seal Status Report (69). The Clerk shall retain docket entry no. 69 under seal, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/21/10.(ebs, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 77 RESPONSE to #69 Plaintiff's Status Report, by Defendant M & T Bank. (Public entry for #74 Sealed Document filed 4/15/10). Text only entry - no document attached. (ebssl, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM regarding #75 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Status Report filed by M & T Bank.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/15/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 75 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Status Report by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kitaev, Erica)
April 15, 2010 Filing 74 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant M & T Bank. (Kitaev, Erica)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER : Status Conference set for 4/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/15/10. (bnbcd, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM regarding #71 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Status Report #69 filed by Karene'e Williams.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/14/10. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Status Report #69 by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams, Counter Defendant Karene'e Williams. (Janiszewski, Steven)
April 14, 2010 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM by Deputy Clerk re #69 Status Report. (ebs, )
April 14, 2010 Filing 69 SEALED-STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams, Counter Defendant Karene'e Williams. (Janiszewski, Steven) Modified on 4/14/2010 to seal document pursuant to the memorandum of 4/14/10 (ebs, ).
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MINUTE ORDER : The parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a) on or before April 19, 2010, or a status report addressing why dismissal has not been accomplished, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/12/10. (bnbcd, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: On or before April 12, 2010, the parties shall file a stipulation of or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/29/10. (bnbcd, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Settlement Conference held on 3/29/2010. A settlement conference was held today, and a settlement was reached as to all claims. The parties shall file a motion or stipulated to dismiss on or before April 12, 2010. (bnbcd, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2010 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/2/10. (bnbcd, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Courtroom Minutes Amended to correct the case number re #62 Scheduling Conference. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/2/10. (bnbcd, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland: Scheduling Conference held on 2/2/2010. Discovery due by 8/2/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 9/2/2010. Settlement Conference set for 3/29/2010 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (Court Reporter FTR-G.Mattei.) (bnbcd, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 61 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Janiszewski, Steven)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference reset for 2/2/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/28/09. (bnbcd, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/22/09. (bnbcd, )
December 2, 2009 Filing 58 Clerk's NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT : default will not be entered as to Karene'e Williams. (ebs, )
November 30, 2009 Filing 57 Answer To Counterclaim #53 ANSWER/REPLY to #53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Karene'e Williams.(Janiszewski, Steven)
November 18, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance For Plaintiff by Steven C. Janiszewski on behalf of Karene'e Williams (Janiszewski, Steven)
November 17, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant's Counterclaim Against Plaintiff by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica Gann Kitaev, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Kitaev, Erica)
October 23, 2009 Filing 54 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #33 Exhibit B, to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (ebs, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 53 Defendant M&T Bank's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Karene'e Williams by M & T Bank.(Quiat, Laurin)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER striking #51 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR10.1(K), by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/15/09.(ebs, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 51 STRICKEN-MOTION for a Continuance, by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (ebs, ) Modified on 10/15/2009 to strike motion pursuant to the Minute Order of 10/15/09 (ebs, ).
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER striking #49 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance, for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR10.1(K), by Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/14/09.(ebs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 49 STRICKEN-MOTION for Continuance by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (sah, ) Modified on 10/14/2009 to strike motion pursuant to the Minute Order of 10/14/09 (ebs, ).
October 8, 2009 Filing 48 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings, pursuant to the Courtroom Minutes of 10/8/09: M & T Bank answer due 10/16/2009. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (ebs, )
October 8, 2009 Filing 47 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing proceedings held before Judge Walker D. Miller on 10/8/2009: Granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anne Thomas Sulton terminated; Denying as Moot #13 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting #32 Motion to Set Aside. Defendant shall file answer to complaint by 10/16/09. Court Reporter Gwen Daniel. (babia)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER granting #45 Motion to Withdraw Document. Withdrawing #36 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/30/09.(gmssl, )
September 29, 2009 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Document re #36 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne)
September 18, 2009 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition to #36 MOTION for Attorney Fees And Costs filed by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quiat, Laurin)
September 17, 2009 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copies of subpoena served upon and letter sent to Jauan Harris)(Sulton, Anne)
September 10, 2009 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to appear by telephone and request for hearing (if not otherwise decided). By Jane Trexler, Judicial Assistant/Deputy Clerk on behalf of Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/10/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (wdmsec, )
September 9, 2009 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to appear by telephone during hearing set for October 8, 2009 at 2:00 pm by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne)
September 3, 2009 Filing 40 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Walker D. Miller, pursuant to the minute order of 9/3/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (gms, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER re: #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by M & T Bank In Court Hearing set for 10/8/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Walker D. Miller. By Jane Trexler, Judicial Assistant, on behalf of Judge Walker D. Miller on 9/3/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
September 2, 2009 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT re #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, #34 Brief in Opposition to Motion, supplemental affidavit of attorney Anne Sulton by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part of plaintiff's loan file obtained from title company doing closing)(Sulton, Anne)
September 2, 2009 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quiat, Laurin)
August 26, 2009 Filing 36 WITHDRAWN - MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sulton Billing Statement, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne) Modified on 10/1/2009 to indicate withdrawn pursuant to the minute order of 9/30/09 (gmssl, ).
August 16, 2009 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Withdraw, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne)
August 16, 2009 Filing 34 BRIEF in Opposition to #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Williams' Paycheck Stubs 2004 and 2008, #2 Affidavit Attorney Anne T. Sulton)(Sulton, Anne)
July 23, 2009 Filing 33 BRIEF in Support of #32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(C) filed by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Quiat, Laurin)
July 23, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of #14 Default by Defendant M & T Bank. (Quiat, Laurin) (Modified on 7/24/2009 added link to default)(erv, ).
July 20, 2009 Filing 31 Minute Entry - Courtroom Minutes for Hearing on Motion to Vacate Hearing held before Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/20/2009. ORDERED: Motion to Vacate Hearing Set for July 23, 2009 #25 is granted upon the conditions that (1) the motion to set aside default is filed by July 23, 2009, and (2) defendant pay plaintiff's travel costs, hotel costs and attorney fees, including those attorney fees incurred in responding to the Motion to Vacate Hearing. If counsel cannot agree on the amount, Ms. Sulton may file a motion for costs and fees. As stipulated by the parties, there will be no eviction of plaintiff pending determination of the motion to set aside default. (Court Reporter Kara Spitler) (lbush)
July 20, 2009 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to #25 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Set for July 23, 2009 filed by Defendant M & T Bank. (Quiat, Laurin)
July 20, 2009 Filing 29 Docket Annotation re: #28 Response to Motion, This is actually an Exhibit to a #27 Response to a Motion, the text has been edited to reflect that change) Text only entry - no document attached (erv, ) (Modified on 7/20/2009 corrected link to #27 )(erv2, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 28 EXHIBITS to RESPONSE #27 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Set for July 23, 2009 subpoenas issued to witnesses filed by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Sulton, Anne) (Modified on 7/20/2009 These are exhibits to a response.)(erv, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Set for July 23, 2009 in opposition filed by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anne T. Sulton)(Sulton, Anne)
July 17, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erica Gann Kitaev on behalf of M & T Bank (Kitaev, Erica)
July 17, 2009 Filing 25 MOTION to Vacate Hearing Set for July 23, 2009 by Defendant M & T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order to Vacate Hearing)(Quiat, Laurin)
July 17, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laurin D. Quiat on behalf of M & T Bank (Quiat, Laurin)
July 14, 2009 Filing 23 Docket Annotation re: #21 MOTION for Default Judgment and #22 Affidavit. Docket entry 21 was modified to create linkage and edit text to more clearly state title of document. Docket entry 22 was modified to edit text to state that document 21 is an affidavit. Text only entry - no document attached. (ebs, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #21 Affidavit attorney's fees by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Sulton, Anne) Modified on 7/14/2009 to edit text to state that document 21 is an affidavit (ebs, ).
July 13, 2009 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Anne T. Sulton, in response to #16 Minute Order by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) suggested form of judgment and proposed order, #2 Affidavit Attorney Darold Killmer)(Sulton, Anne) Modified on 7/14/2009 to create linkage and edit text to more clearly state title of document (ebs, ).
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference set for July 7, 2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/30/09.TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (bnbsec, )
June 30, 2009 Filing 19 Docket Annotation re: #17 MOTION to Vacate. This docket entry was modified to delete linkage and alter text to reflect the title of this document. Text only entry - no document attached (gmssl, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 MOTION to Vacate #9 Order on Motion to Stay, Request to Vacate Scheduling Conference set for July 7, 2009 filed by Karene'e Williams.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/30/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference set for July 7, 2009 by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne) Modified on 6/30/2009 to delete linkage and alter text to reflect the title of this document (gmssl, ).
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment set for 7/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge Walker D. Miller, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 6/10/09.(gms, )
June 10, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #14 Clerk's Entry of Default Request for Hearing on Damages by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne)
June 8, 2009 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to M & T Bank (jjh, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant M & T Bank by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attorney Anne T. Sulton)(Sulton, Anne)
April 23, 2009 Filing 12 Docket Annotation re: #11 Receipt. This entry was completed in the incorrect case. Text only entry - no document attached (jjh, )
April 22, 2009 Filing 11 Return RECEIPT from the United States District Court Western District of Michigan (jjh, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 10 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: M & T Bank answer due 6/1/2009 pursuant to the Minute Order of 04/20/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (jjh, )
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay Proceedings for 45 Days and Certificate of Complaince. Defendant shall answer or respond to complaint by 06/01/09. Ordered that the scheduling conference has been reset for 7/7/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/20/09.(jjh, )
April 16, 2009 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay proceedings for 45 days filed by Karene'e Williams.Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/16/09. TEXT ONLY ENTRY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED(wdmsec, )
April 16, 2009 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Stay proceedings for 45 days by Plaintiff Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sulton, Anne)
April 2, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karene'e Williams. M & T Bank served on 4/2/2009, answer due 4/22/2009. (Sulton, Anne)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/26/09. (ebs, )
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/25/09. (ebs, )
February 25, 2009 Filing 3 LETTER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Walker D. Miller for all further proceedings. Judge John L. Kane no longer assigned to the case. (sah, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior District Judge Kane. (sah, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against M & T Bank ( Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number COX016757) Summons issued, filed by Karene'e Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(llk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. M & T Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & T Bank
Represented By: Laurin D. Quiat
Represented By: Erica Gann Kitaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karene'e Williams
Represented By: Steven C. Janiszewski
Represented By: Anne Thomas Sulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?