Brim v. Zavaras et al
Petitioner: Ernest Brim
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras, Steve Hartley, Brown and Smith
Case Number: 1:2009cv00429
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 26 Notice of Appeal by Ernest Brim, by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/23/09. (bjrsl, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of Dismissal. Ordered that the habeas corpus application is denied and the action is dismissed by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 11/04/09. (jjh, )
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 2 Motion for TRO by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk on 09/16/09.(jjhsl, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Cure Deficiency within 30 days by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/04/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brim v. Zavaras et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest Brim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aristedes Zavaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?