Franks v. Safeway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Victor Franks
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00431
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Gunnison
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice. The parties will bear their own attorneys' fees and costs respectively by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 03/10/10. (jjh, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER Setting Trial Date 20 . Amended to add Judge signature to Order by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/02/09. (jjh, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/30/09. (bnbcd, )
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Calendar Call on 10/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Richard P. Matsch by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 07/23/09. (jjh, )
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 5/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/13/09. (jjh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franks v. Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Franks
Represented By: Michael J. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?