Koncilja v. Centura - St Mary - Corwin Hospital
Plaintiff: Carey L. Koncilja
Defendant: Centura - St Mary - Corwin Hospital
Case Number: 1:2009cv00436
Filed: March 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Motion to Stay. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further Order of Court. The parties shall file jointly, on the first day of each month beginning January 1, 2010, and for each month thereafter, a written Status Report concerning the companion case 09-CV-01642-REB-MJW. Status Report due by 1/1/2010. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/7/09.(erv, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Complaint; The Amended Complaint is accepted for filing as of the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/30/2009.(mjwcd )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 6/26/09. (wydcd, rrk) (Modified on 7/6/2009 to add the word AMENDED to the text.(erv, ).
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/26/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koncilja v. Centura - St Mary - Corwin Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey L. Koncilja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura - St Mary - Corwin Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?