USA v. Maisonneuve et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Gerard Maisonneuve and Debra Kay Maisonneuve
Case Number: 1:2009cv00473
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Taxes Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Petitioners Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing. the Court hereby ORDERS that the show cause hearing currently scheduled for September 14, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. is VACATED. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/11/09.(erv, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/09. Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2009. Show Cause Hearing Reset for 9/14/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 602 before Judge Christine M. Arguello. No further extensions will be granted. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/3/09.(erv, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denied and Stricken 11 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 05/22/09.(jjhsl, )
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL ENFORCEMENT ORDER re: 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by USA; Respondents shall comply with and obey the IRS summonses served upon them by appearing at the IRS office at 56 Inverness Drive East, Englewood, Colorado, 80112 before Reve nue Officer John Boetz, telephone number (720) 956-4144, (or other location to be agreed upon by the parties), at a time to be agreed upon by the parties, but not later than May 19, 2009, to give testimony and to produce for examination and copying t he records, documents, and other data demanded by the IRS summonses. Upon entry of this Order, this case shall be closed and Judgment shall be entered in favor of the Petitioner. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/21/09. (erv, ) (Modified on 4/21/2009 to complete the title of the Text)(erv, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Maisonneuve et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Amanda Adams Rocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Maisonneuve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Kay Maisonneuve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?