Loeffler v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Loeffler
Defendant: United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00478
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Consumer Credit Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay his or its own attorney's fees and costs. by Chief Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/17/09. (erv, )
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Defendants Unopposed Motion for for Telephonic Appearance at Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/9/09.(erv, )
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/09. (erv, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/12/09. (erv, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loeffler v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Loeffler
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?