Reed v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Plaintiff: Heather Reed
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 1:2009cv00479
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Insurance Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay her or its own costs and attorneys fees. by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/7/09. (erv, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Deadlines and to Amend Scheduling Order. ORDERED that the 16 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Discovery due by 3/12/2010; Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2010; Final Pretrial Conference is RESET to 5/25/2010, at 9:15 a.m., in Courtroom A 402; and parties' joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 5/18/2010, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 9/14/09.(cbssec) (Modified on 9/15/2009 corrected year to 2010 for PTO)(erv, ).
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Amended Unopposed 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time 20 is GRANTED. Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time [19-2] tendered t o the court on August 10, 2009, is accepted for filing as of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time 19 is MOOT. by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 8/17/09.(erv, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer. by Magistrate Judge Craig B Shaffer on 3/24/09. (erv, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another judge by Judge Walker D. Miller on 03/06/2009. (sah, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Reed
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Represented By: Michael S. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?