BVM Incorporated v. BJ Services Company
Plaintiff: BVM Incorporated
Defendant: BJ Services Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00493
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND TO CLOSE CASE granting 33 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. All claims asserted against one another in the above-captioned matter are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear his, her or its own costs and attorneys fees incurred in connection with this action. The Clerk shall close this case, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/24/2009.(wjc, )
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Confidentiality Agreement and ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/24/09. (kmtcd)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER-CIVIL: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2010 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 901 before Judge Marcia S. Krieger. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/4/09. (msksec, )
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/4/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/12/09. (wjc, )
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and deposition s from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/11/09. (mskcd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BVM Incorporated v. BJ Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BVM Incorporated
Represented By: Phil (Phillip) L. Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ Services Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?